HI HB156 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB156
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the qualifications for membership for the Contractors License Board. Specifies that the Contractors License Board must prioritize the protection of the public above all other considerations when exercising its functions.
Title
Relating To Contractors License Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB156 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=156&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB156_.HTM |