HI HB1527 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the general excise tax on tobacco products other than cigarettes; designates a percentage of this increase to cervical and breast cancer screening and the Healthy Start program. (HB1527 HD1)
Title
Tobacco Products; General Excise Tax; Cancer Screening Special Fund; Healthy Start Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 452) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Bertram, Carroll, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Carroll, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Finnegan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT-HUS on Friday, 02-06-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |