HI HB1525 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to GVO/EDU, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to GVO/EDU, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional guidance and updates the reporting obligations for state departments, including the department of education, pursuant to Acts 175 and 176 (SLH 2021), which established programmatic goals for the purchase and procurement of locally sourced products. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EDU, CPN/WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 694-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | Re-referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 14 |
2022-02-03 | House | Re-referred to GVR, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 8 |
2022-01-28 | House | Re-referred to AGR/GVR, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2671 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Department of Education
Locally Sourced Products
Procurement
Produce Contracts
Reporting Requirements
State Departments
Locally Sourced Products
Procurement
Produce Contracts
Reporting Requirements
State Departments