HI HB1515 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1515
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires guards to meet mandatory instruction and training requirements within 60 days after hiring. Provides for first registration renewal no sooner than two years from initial registration. Requires employers to submit a monthly list of newly hired guards to the Board of Private Detectives and Guards. (HB1515 HD1)
Title
Relating To Security Guards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to IAC, LAB, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1264 (Same As)
HB1515 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
HB1515 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).