HI HB1507 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Referred to EET, CPH.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Referred to EET, CPH.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a working group to study methods to reduce the use of all disposable bags. (HB1507 HD2)
Title
Working Group; Reduction in the Use of Disposable Bags
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPH. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 10). |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-02-08 | House | Deferred one day 02-09-16. |
2016-02-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 02-08-16. |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-01-27 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, C. Lee. |
2016-01-26 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 01-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-27-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-01-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 01-25-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-06-15 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-04-15. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-02-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-15. |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-13 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-18-15 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |