HI HB1505 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1505
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the EUTF to consider investment opportunities in industries that will sustain Hawaii's natural environment or produce economic opportunities for its residents, including renewable energy businesses and businesses that use investment capital to acquire the infrastructure and services needed to become energy sustainable. Appropriates funds to the EUTF. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1505 (Carry Over) 2023-03-15 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.