HI HB1491 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to provide written notice to the director of finance no less than fifteen days prior to any transfer of special fund moneys between special funds and prior to any use of special fund moneys for purposes outside of the statutory purpose of the special fund. Requires the University of Hawaii to provide written notice to the director of finance no less than fifteen days prior to any transfer of appropriated funds and positions for the operating cost category among programs, and among cost elements in a program. Effective July 1, 2525. (SD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Budget; Program Execution; Special Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 1:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Kahele, Kouchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Choy, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 517) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3376) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2966) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 03-18-14 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 121). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 152-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Ohno, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2014-01-21 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 01-28-14 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Meeting Scheduled on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:00PM in conference room 309 has been canceled. |
2014-01-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2552 (Same As) 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.