HI HB1488 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a criminal trespass on agricultural lands enforcement fund; provides that owners of agricultural land or range land have no duty of care to trespassers; establishes rebuttable presumption of no liability; permits trespasser to overcome presumption by preponderance of evidence that owner was grossly negligent or intentionally injured the trespasser; authorized fines of up to $10,000 for the offense of criminal trespass on agricultural lands.
Title
Landowner Liability; Trespass
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-11-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1079 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1488 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1488_.HTM |