HI HB1486 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 054, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 054, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of theft in the first degree to specifically include theft of a motor vehicle or motorcycle. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 054, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 054, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154). |
2022-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741). |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2). |
2022-04-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 732). |
2022-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-22. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 726). |
2022-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Ilagan, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2022-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Misalucha). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-01-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3560) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Fevella. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 9:31AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 241). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 237-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |