HI HB1482 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET/CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET/CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a crowdfunding exemption for limited intrastate investments between Hawaii residents and Hawaii businesses, limited to no more than $1,000,000 raised over a twelve month period, and no more than $5,000 per investor. Includes disclaimer requirements. (HB1482 HD2)
Title
Crowdfunding; Hawaii Invests Local Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/CPH, JDL. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EDT/CPN, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 330). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-15 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |