HI HB148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes felony and misdemeanor offenses for injuring or killing an animal engaged in law enforcement or corrections activities. Provides for an affirmative defense. (HB148 HD1)
Title
Crime; Animal Cruelty; Law Enforcement and Corrections Animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 494) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Wooley. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-13. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |