HI HB1458 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an appropriation for the state rent supplement program. (HB1458 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 262) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1395 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 225.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback