HI HB144 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB144

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the monetary threshold that triggers disclosure of electioneering communications. Requires that disclosures of electioneering communications occur on the date the electioneering communications are publicly distributed. Classifies election advertisements sent by mail at any postal rate as electioneering communications. Repeals the requirement that a person be treated as having made an expenditure if the person has executed a contract to make the expenditure. Excludes candidate and candidate committees from the disclosure requirements. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electioneering Communications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to JDC.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 187).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-03HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
2021-03-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB404 (Same As)
HB144 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback