HI HB1438 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all sweetened beverages to contain a warning label.
Title
Sugar-Sweetened Beverages; Obesity; Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-11-15 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1270 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1438&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1438_.HTM |