HI HB1418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 070, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 070, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the county exemptions from building permit and building code requirements to ensure that Hawaii's communities are not suspended from participation in the National Flood Insurance Program. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Act 070, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171). |
2017-07-06 | House | Act 070, on 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2017-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McKelvey, Oshiro excused (3). |
2017-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2017-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-17. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Gabbard, Baker Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 655) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1561) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, CPH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 193). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-02-24 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:55PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-17. |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |