HI HB1411 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the conversion of nonjudicial power of sale foreclosures to judicial foreclosures in certain cases; authorizes recordation of notice of default and intent to foreclose; specifies allowable locations for public auction of foreclosed properties; specifies prohibited conduct; requires suspension of actions by junior lienholders during the pendency of foreclosure; provides that violations of chapter 667 by foreclosing mortgagees shall be unfair and deceptive trade practices; prohibits deficiency judgments after nonjudicial foreclosure; specifies that the interest of a mortgagor is extinguished upon recordation of affidavit of sale; imposes requirements for mortgage servicers including physical presence within the State; creates dispute resolution process for nonjudicial foreclosures; creates dispute resolution special fund; creates requirements for notice of default; makes conforming amendments; makes appropriation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Mortgage Foreclosures; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 9:45AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Keith-Agaran, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Ito, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 583) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Kidani, Solomon . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-23-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN/JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 322). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Pine voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Riviere voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Souki. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Souki. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-16-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-09-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |