HI HB1377 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes establishment of the Hawaii Airports Corporation within the Department of Transportation for administrative purposes. Sets out appointment of members to the board of directors and powers and duties of the Hawaii Airports Corporation. Transfers aeronautics functions of the Department of Transportation to the Hawaii Airports Corporation by the established transfer completion date agreed upon by the Hawaii Airports Corporation, the Director of Transportation, and the Governor, which shall be no later than 12/31/2022. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To An Airports Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback