HI HB1353 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1353
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends each county's authority to establish and collect a surcharge on state general excise and use taxes. Requires a county's share of the county surcharge on state tax to be paid to the county on a monthly basis. Deletes the repeal date for Act 247, Session Laws of Hawaii 2005, authorizing counties to levy a surcharge to fund public transportation systems.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1353 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1176 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
SB1176 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1353&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1353_.HTM |