HI HB135 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the relationship between the Uniform Commercial Code article 4A and the federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code Article 4A; Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Har. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=135&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB135_.HTM |