HI HB1347 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires at least ten per cent of the moneys expended from the State Highway Fund to be used for projects designed to fulfill the requirements of the complete streets initiative.
Title
Transportation Alternatives; Highway Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1347 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1347_.HTM |