HI HB134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Act 240, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Act 240, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reauthorizes the counties' authority to establish a county surcharge on state tax for a limited time period, with the surcharge to be effective until 12/31/2027, if adopted. Requires counties to adopt an ordinance to establish or extend a surcharge prior to 7/1/2016. Limits the use of surcharge revenues by counties that have already established a county surcharge on state tax to capital costs. Expands the definition of capital costs for counties with a population greater than 500,000. Amends the definition of "public lands" to include the air rights over any portion of state land upon which a county mass transit project is developed after 7/11/2005. (HB134 CD1)
Title
Public Transit; County Surcharge on State Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Act 240, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2015-07-15 | House | Act 240, on 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Cullen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Johanson, Kobayashi, Kong, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Ohno, San Buenaventura, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (12) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Shimabukuro . 4 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom, L. Thielen, Wakai. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 166). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 166) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Tokuda, Harimoto, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Aquino, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 3:45PM in Conference Room 309. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:45PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 1:45PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Espero, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Kouchi. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Aquino, Onishi, McDermott. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Wakai . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Riviere, Slom, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from TRA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Espero, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to TRA/PSM, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Ichiyama, Jordan, Keohokalole, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Johanson, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Ohno, Thielen, Tupola, Ward, Yamashita voting no (11) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Creagan, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Jordan, Keohokalole, Matsumoto, McDermott, Ohno, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Johanson, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Lowen, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Belatti, Nishimoto excused (2). |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Cullen, Jordan, Keohokalole, Tokioka, Pouha; 7 Noes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, DeCoite, Johanson, Kobayashi, Lowen, Yamashita, Ward; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |