HI HB1330 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends until June 30, 2015, the portion of Hawaii tobacco settlement special fund moneys allocated for annual operating expenses of JABSOM, and annually reduces these amounts by a certain percentage beginning in FY 2012-2013. Increases the portion of Hawaii tobacco settlement special fund moneys going to the general fund until June 30, 2015. Adds annual reporting requirements for JABSOM. Effective 7/1/2117. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii Tobacco Settlement Special Fund; JABSOM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Green, Ige, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 651). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Nakashima. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Nishimoto, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; M. Lee, Ching. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, English, Fukunaga, Kim, Kouchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Ryan, Wakai ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from EDU/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai, Slom. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-23-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Marumoto, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morita, Rhoads, Takai, Takumi voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morita, Rhoads, Takai, Takumi voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Chang, Mizuno, Saiki, Wooley, Ching, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takai, Takumi; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-15-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads voting no (2) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 186) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-08-11 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HLT, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB239 (Same As) 2011-04-27 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 10:00AM in conference room 229.