HI HB1324 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1324
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commercial rent relief grant program to be administered by the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism. Requires that the commercial rent relief grants be given priority for moneys received through federal funding. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Property Rent Relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797). |
2022-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 9:50AM in conference room CR 229. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:00AM in conference room CR 229. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Quinlan, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Eli, Ward. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kanuha, Kidani. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 781) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-31-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 173). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from PDP/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP/ECD on Thursday, 02-04-21 11:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to PDP/ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1324 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 9:50AM in conference room CR 229.