HI HB1323 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1323

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a regulatory structure for common interest agricultural communities on lands classified as agricultural. Specifies requirements for development, creation, registration, governance, and management of common interest agricultural communities. Requires county approval of proposed common interest agricultural community projects. Prohibits approval for condominium property regimes created under chapter 514B, Hawaii Revised Statutes, on lands classified as agricultural. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Common Interest Agricultural Communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1361 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1323 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback