HI HB1312 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1312
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to include in certain employment agreements that address intellectual property rights a condition requiring the employees to make a good faith effort to sell or license intellectual property to a farmer or agricultural producer within the State prior to selling or licensing the intellectual property to an entity outside the State. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Intellectual Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 112) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1312 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources
Employment Contracts
Intellectual Property Rights
UH
Employment Contracts
Intellectual Property Rights
UH