HI HB1311 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a K-12 Agriculture Workforce Development Pipeline Initiative in DLIR to conduct training for teachers and school administrators in agricultural self-sufficiency. Appropriates funds. (HB1311 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 168) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1311 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).