HI HB1294 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this Act is to require transfer of nonfacility general fund per-pupil allocations of special education students of a department of education school to a charter school upon receipt of the completed intent to enroll form of the student at the charter school subject to certain conditions, including parent or guardian confirmation and notice of intent of the student's transfer to and enrollment in the charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 299).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none.
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback