HI HB1280 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Lowers the right to vote in state and local elections to those who are sixteen years of age or older per the Hawaii Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing An Amendment To The Hawaii Constitution, Article Ii, Section 1, To Expand The Right To Vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback