HI HB128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the felony offenses of misuse of unmanned aircraft in the 1st, 2nd, and 3rd degrees.
Title
Relating To Unmanned Aircraft.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB229 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB128 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
HB128 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=128&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB128_.HTM |