HI HB1279 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1279

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee

Summary

Appropriates funds for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021 operating budget of the Campaign Spending Commission and Office of Elections under the purview of the House of Representatives Standing Committee on Judiciary. (HB1279 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Oversight Of Election Activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 460).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:15PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1279 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback