HI HB1276 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1276
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to authorize state and county traffic projects to make changes, as necessary, to traffic flow and mitigation efforts. Prohibits contractors from charging additional fees to amend traffic flow and safety or mitigation efforts. Requires the department of transportation to make a final determination on all changes to traffic flow and mitigation. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Traffic Control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-02-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1276 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB1243 (Same As) 2023-02-09 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
SB1243 (Same As) 2023-02-09 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.