HI HB1273 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 165, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Intellectual and Developmental Disabilities Medicaid Waiver Administrative Claiming Special Fund to capture federal moneys resulting from DOH's participation in the SSA 1915(c) waiver program. Requires DOH and DHS to work with stakeholders to develop and distribute information about accessing Medicaid services for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities. (HB1273 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateAct 165, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
2019-07-03HouseAct 165, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki, S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 843) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1928) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-19 10:45AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 112).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 9:15AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-30HouseRe-referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 8
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback