HI HB1273 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the use of clotheslines at any privately owned single-family residential dwelling or townhouse. Allows reasonable restrictions on the use of clotheslines. (SD2)
Title
Solar Energy; Clotheslines
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 589). | |
2009-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2009-04-17 | (H) House conferees appointed: Morita, Cabanilla Co-Chairs; Chong, Thielen. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 567). | |
2009-04-16 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 583) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Sakamoto, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-07-09 10:00am in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Hooser, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-09 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 33). | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Reported from EEP/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Re-referred to EEP/HSG, referral sheet 20 | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chong, Coffman, Ito, C. Lee, Morita, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Har, Herkes, Luke. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chong, Ito, C. Lee, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Har, Herkes, Luke. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Tuesday, 02-17-09 9:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Re-referred to EEP/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EEP/HSG, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |