HI HB1272 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Act 039, 5/6/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Act 039, 5/6/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a public accommodation that owns, leases, leases to, or operates a motion picture theater in more than two locations in the State to provide open movie captioning during at least two showings per week of each motion picture that is produced and offered with open movie captioning. Requires a public accommodation that owns, leases, leases to, or operates a motion picture theater in the State to provide, upon request, audio description of any motion picture that is produced and offered with audio description. Effective January 1, 2016 and sunsets January 1, 2018. (SD2)
Title
Motion Picture Theaters; Accommodation; Open Movie Captioning; Audio Description
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Act 039, 5/6/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139). |
2015-05-07 | House | Act 039, on 5/6/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 627). |
2015-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-04-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 622). |
2015-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-15. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2015-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 499) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:35AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Nakashima, Woodson, McDermott. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-23 | House | Re-referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 23 |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 200) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-05 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-06-15 9:20AM in conference room 312. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-06-15 9:20AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |