HI HB1270 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 173, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1275).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 173, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1275).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the hospital sustainability program for two years. Clarifies exemptions from the hospital sustainability fee and increases the allowable aggregate fees to be charged. Appropriates funds out of the hospital sustainability special fund for fiscal years 2019-2020 and 2020-2021. (HB1270 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hospital Sustainability Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Act 173, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1275). |
2019-07-03 | House | Act 173, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1275). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 15). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Mizuno, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ward. |
2019-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Mizuno, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Eli, Ward. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 842) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2014) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1250) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 110). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).