HI HB1270 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of taxation to evaluate certain tax credits, exclusions, and exemptions and report to the legislature. Effective 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Tax Credits, Exclusions, and Exemptions; Evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Espero, Fukunaga. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Ward. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1120) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fukunaga. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-11 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-23-11 10:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-24-11 10:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-24-11 10:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 298). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Ward voting no (1) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-28-11. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 6:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |