HI HB1268 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 236, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 236, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows 999-year homestead leases to be assigned to trustees of land trusts that are created for managing and holding the homestead leasehold estate for the benefit of the lessee and lessee's family members. (SD1)
Title
Public Land Trust Lands; 999-Year Homestead Lease; Assignment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 236, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 236, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339). |
2013-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 711). |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Cheape, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, Har, Hashem, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Choy, Nakashima, Yamane excused (3). |
2013-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 702). |
2013-04-17 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 574) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WTL/THA/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Hee, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/THA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/THA/JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL/THA, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 346). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Fale, Jordan, Oshiro, Say, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Choy, Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Ito, McDermott, Tokioka, Tsuji voting no (9) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Takumi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |