HI HB1255 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a terminally ill, competent adult of at least 50 years of age to get lethal dose of medication to end life. Prohibits physicians and others from administering mercy killings, lethal injections, and active euthanasia. Requires informed consent. Allows alternate doctor to replace attending doctor if latter declines to prescribe. Requires monitor at time of taking dose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death with Dignity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-17 Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
2015-02-02HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-28HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback