HI HB1247 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state and county law enforcement agencies from complying with federal immigration detainers or honoring requests for non-public information unless specifically required to do so by a warrant signed by a judge or provisions of federal, state, or local law.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB557 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1247 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1247 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Federal Immigration Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1247&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1247_.HTM |