HI HB1244 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for religious institutions or organizations to refuse to provide services related to the solemnization of same-sex relationships where the religious institution or organization finds the solemnization to be in violation of its religious beliefs or faith, without becoming subject to civil liability. Effective January 2, 2012. (HB1244 HD1)
Title
Solemnization; Lawful Refusal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 293). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Fontaine. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-24-11 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred to 2-24-11. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-08-11 2:15PM in House conference room Auditorium. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |