HI HB1236 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commences the transfer of the Oahu regional health care system in its entirety from the Hawaii health systems corporation to the department of health, beginning with the transfer of the Oahu regional health care system's budget and position count into the department of health. Enables the Oahu regional health care system, department of health, Hawaii health systems corporation, and other state agencies to manage and implement the processes required to effectuate the completion of such transition. Part II takes effect on 6/30/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Transition Of The Oahu Regional Health Care System From The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Into The Department Of Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseReferred to HHH, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback