HI HB1234 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1234
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the chairperson of the board of land and natural resources to establish a task force to make recommendations on how to allow public and private employees to work at least one day a week to protect the environment, reduce wear on infrastructure, decrease traffic congestion, and reduce motor vehicle accidents.
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1234 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB941 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL/LCA, WAM.
SB941 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL/LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1234&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1234_.HTM |