HI HB1229 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1229
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public procurement construction bids to list subcontractors and joint contractors only for contracts with an unspecified total value; provided that bids lacking this list may be accepted if in the State's best interest and the value of the work to be performed by the joint contractor or subcontractor is equal to or less than an unspecified per cent of the total bid amount. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 2:15PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 1:05PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Keith-Agaran, English Co-Chairs; K. Rhoads, Ruderman. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Holt, Nakashima, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2017-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 533) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 171). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka, Tupola. |
2017-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-02-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1229 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 309.