HI HB1228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a penalty of up to $5,000 for the fourth or subsequent violations of the motor carrier law within one calendar year.
Title
Relating To Motor Carrier Penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1228 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB766 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 104, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
SB766 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 104, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1228&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1228_.HTM |