HI HB1227 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits offshore drilling for oil, natural gas, or minerals in state marine waters. Prohibits issuance of permits for or in connection with the development or operation of any facility or infrastructure associated with offshore drilling for oil, natural gas, or minerals in state waters. Provides exception for collection of sand for state beach replenishment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Natural Resources.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseReferred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1006 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback