HI HB1226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state administrative regulatory actions and county regulatory actions from banning or otherwise regulating activities related to genetically modified plant organisms, with certain exceptions (HB1226 HD1)
Title
Genetically Modified Organisms; Preemption; Exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to ENE/TIA, WTL. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 238). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Berg, Carroll, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takumi, Thielen, Wooley voting no (14) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Carroll, Morita voting no (2) and Representative(s) Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 692) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, McKelvey, Wakai. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-04-09 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Re-referred to AGR, referral sheet 13 | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |