HI HB1225 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1225

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the certification and other requirements (including permitted advertising, programs, caregiver requirements, caregiver-child ratio, and number of supervised children) for family child care homes and group child care homes. Allows group child care homes in residential and agricultural areas. (HB1225 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Care Homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 186) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Mizuno, Say.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSH, IAC, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1225 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback