HI HB1223 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to authorize the legislature to increase the general excise tax by not more than one percentage point and dedicate the proceeds to funding a state long-term care program as prescribed by the legislature.
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Long Term Care; General Excise Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1223&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1223_.HTM |