HI HB1221 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires charter school authorizers to provide a list of approved independent auditors, rather than selecting three independent auditors, from which their respective charter school is to select an independent auditor for its annual financial audit. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Charter Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-11-21 3:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback