HI HB1221 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 4:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 4:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a liquor licensee from liability for certain violations if the licensee has in place a security plan approved by the liquor commission to prevent consumption of liquor by a minor and the licensee acts in good faith to implement the plan. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD2)
Title
Intoxicating Liquor; Liquor Commission; Liquor Licensees Security Plans
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Hermina Morita [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 4:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Baker, Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Ito, Takai, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, ERB, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1257) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 04-08-11 9:45AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-06-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from PGM/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Solomon. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-23-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan, Slom. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-11 2:55PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to PGM/CPN, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 287). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Morita. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-02-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 23 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to ERB, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB740 (Same As) 2011-02-08 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.